Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Severi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1903BornPieve Sestina di Cesena
19 Dec 192522.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 194844.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
21 Jun 194844.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
24 Aug 194845.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
8 Jan 195349.5AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
31 Jul 195754.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
29 Nov 196663.4AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
7 Oct 197572.2ResignedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
25 Mar 198480.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Severi:
Bishop Pietro Severi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palestrina

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015