Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Legarra Tellechea, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Veraguas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1910BornMurguindueta, Spain
19 Mar 193323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
6 Nov 196353.7AppointedPrelate of Bocas del Toro, Panama
18 Mar 196555.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
6 Jun 196555.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana
3 Apr 196959.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
15 Feb 197565.0ResignedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
15 Jun 198575.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama

MicroData Summary for Martin Legarra Tellechea
Bishop Martin Legarra Tellechea O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Veraguas

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016