Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentino Armas Lerena, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Chota, Peru

Titular Bishop of Macomades


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1900Born
18 Mar 192322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
7 Apr 196362.4AppointedPrelate of Chota, Peru
8 Apr 196766.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades
4 Jun 196766.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macomades
17 Aug 197675.8RetiredPrelate of Chota, Peru
25 Nov 197979.1DiedPrelate Emeritus of Chota, Peru

MicroData Summary for Florentino Armas Lerena
Bishop Florentino Armas Lerena O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Chota

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Millan de la Cogolla, Spain

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018