Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Mario Brown Jiménez

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Veraguas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1937 BornPanamá
20 Jan 197436.5Ordained PriestPriest of Panamá
30 Dec 198548.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
30 Dec 198548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
22 Feb 198648.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
17 Dec 199457.4AppointedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
11 Feb 199557.5InstalledBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
30 Apr 201375.7RetiredBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama

MicroData Summary for Oscar Mario Brown Jiménez:
Bishop Oscar Mario Brown Jiménez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Veraguas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago de Veraguas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013