Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcos Gregorio McGrath, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1924BornPanamá
11 Jun 194925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
8 Aug 196137.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
8 Aug 196137.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
8 Oct 196137.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
3 Mar 196440.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
5 Feb 196945.0AppointedArchbishop of Panamá
18 Apr 199470.2RetiredArchbishop of Panamá
4 Aug 200076.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Marcos Gregorio McGrath:
Archbishop Marcos Gregorio McGrath C.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013