Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Luis Cardinal Lacunza Maestrojuán, O.A.R.

Bishop of David

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe da Copertino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1944 BornPamplona, Spain
13 Jul 196925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
30 Dec 198541.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
30 Dec 198541.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Parthenia
18 Jan 198641.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parthenia
29 Oct 199450.6AppointedBishop of Chitré, Panama
2 Jul 199955.3AppointedBishop of David, Panama
14 Feb 201570.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201570.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe da Copertino

MicroData Summary for José Luis Lacunza Maestrojuán:
José Luis Cardinal Lacunza Maestrojuán O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of David

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of David.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015