Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rómulo Emiliani Sánchez, C.M.F.

Auxiliary Bishop of San Pedro Sula

Titular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1948 BornColón
23 Oct 196921.5ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Aug 197628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
15 Dec 198840.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
15 Dec 198840.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
25 Jan 198940.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
2 Feb 200253.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Pedro Sula, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Rómulo Emiliani Sánchez:
Bishop Rómulo Emiliani Sánchez C.M.F. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Pedro Sula

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pedro Sula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013