Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Zuluaga Arteche, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Darién

Titular Bishop of Izirzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1919BornCeánuri, Spain
12 Sep 194324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
9 Dec 197657.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Darién, Panama
9 Dec 197657.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Izirzada
25 Mar 197757.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Izirzada
13 Nov 198162.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Darién, Panama
1 Oct 200283.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Darién, Panama

MicroData Summary for Marcos Zuluaga Arteche:
Bishop Marcos Zuluaga Arteche C.M.F. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Darién

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013