Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos María Ariz Bolea, C.M.F.

Bishop Emeritus of Colón-Kuna Yala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1928 BornMarcilla, Spain
28 Jun 195324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
22 Jul 198152.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
22 Jul 198152.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
21 Nov 198153.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nigrae Maiores
15 Dec 198860.0AppointedBishop of Colón, Panama
18 Jun 200576.5RetiredBishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Ariz Bolea:
Bishop Carlos María Ariz Bolea C.M.F. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colón-Kuna Yala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colón-Kuna Yala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013