Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Joaquin Hernández Cantarero, C.M.F.

Vicar Apostolic of Darién

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1954 BornJinotepe, Nicaragua
15 Nov 198632.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
12 Feb 200550.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Darién, Panama
12 Feb 200550.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
19 Mar 200550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca

MicroData Summary for Pedro Joaquin Hernández Cantarero:
Bishop Pedro Joaquin Hernández Cantarero C.M.F. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Darién

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Darién.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013