Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Varela Server

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Panamá

Titular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1942 Born
28 Jun 197027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Panamá
26 Feb 200461.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
26 Feb 200461.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
17 Apr 200461.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
26 Apr 201976.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Pablo Varela Server
Bishop Pablo Varela Server (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDenia, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Panamá, Archdiocese of Panamá

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Panamá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,572
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Apr 2019

Quantcast