Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Manresa Formosa, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1915BornGuatemala
29 Jul 194833.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
30 Nov 195540.6AppointedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
6 Jan 195640.7Ordained BishopBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
30 May 197964.1ResignedBishop of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala
25 Dec 201095.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Luis Manresa Formosa:
Bishop Luis Manresa Formosa S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 55.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 1
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013