Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angélico Melotto Mazzardo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sololá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1911BornSarego, Italy
9 Aug 192716.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jul 193625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jun 195948.3AppointedBishop of Sololá, Guatemala
19 Jul 195948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sololá, Guatemala
5 Apr 198675.0RetiredBishop of Sololá, Guatemala
11 May 199988.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sololá, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Angélico Melotto Mazzardo:
Bishop Angélico Melotto Mazzardo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sololá

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 69
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013