Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Ernesto Fuentes Duarte

Deceased

Bishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1941Born
28 Jun 196927.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 198038.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
9 Apr 198038.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
15 May 198038.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
18 Oct 198241.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sololá, Guatemala
5 Apr 198644.6SucceededBishop of Sololá, Guatemala
20 Jul 199755.9DiedBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Ernesto Fuentes Duarte
Bishop Eduardo Ernesto Fuentes Duarte (born , died ) Bishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuiriguá

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast