Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango

Dioecesis Sololensis-Chimaltenangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sololá
10 March 1951ErectedArchdiocese of Guatemala
Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
Diocese of Sololá (erected)
27 April 1967Territory LostDiocese of Sololá Diocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché (erected)
Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango
31 December 1996Name ChangedDiocese of Sololá Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sololá
1966586,000600,00097.7%16415710,280414535ap1967
1970489,000525,15393.1%17264311,372274729ap1971
1976520,123528,44098.4%15375210,002426937ap1977
1980546,125642,50085.0%1739569,752508637ap1981
1990710,000872,00081.4%29174615,434225534ap1991
Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango
1999556,321678,94681.9%3754213,245910723ap2000
2000571,552696,59882.0%3954412,989811025ap2001
2001589,427735,39280.2%4334612,813610426ap2002
2002607,140758,45480.0%4634912,390611627ap2003
2003622,425775,70080.2%4534812,967611928ap2004
2004639,177798,97180.0%4634913,044611929ap2005
2010744,000924,00080.5%853888,454612934ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013