Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Rossell y Arellano

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala

Prelate of Esquipulas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1894BornEsquipulas
21 Sep 191824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
8 Jan 193944.4AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
16 Apr 193944.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
16 Sep 195662.1AppointedPrelate of Esquipulas, Guatemala
10 Dec 196470.3DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Mariano Rossell y Arellano:
Archbishop Mariano Rossell y Arellano (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015