Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramiro Pellecer Samayoa

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Teglata in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1929 BornAntiqua
7 Nov 195425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
28 Nov 196738.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
28 Nov 196738.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Teglata in Proconsulari
6 Jan 196838.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teglata in Proconsulari
2 Oct 201081.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José Ramiro Pellecer Samayoa:
Bishop José Ramiro Pellecer Samayoa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013