Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop JuliŠn Raymundo Riveiro y Jacinto, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Titular Archbishop of AntinoŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1854BornCobŠn
3 Apr 187723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Apr 191460.1AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
10 May 191460.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
1921¹66.9ResignedArchbishop of Guatemala
11 Feb 192369.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ
8 May 193177.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for JuliŠn Raymundo Riveiro y Jacinto:
Archbishop JuliŠn Raymundo Riveiro y Jacinto O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1914, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013