Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Dueñas y Argumedo

Deceased

Bishop of San Miguel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1868BornOpico
1 Nov 189123.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
1 Aug 191345.5AppointedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
29 Mar 191446.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
3 Jul 194173.5DiedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Dueñas y Argumedo:
Bishop Juan Antonio Dueñas y Argumedo (born , died ) Bishop of San Miguel

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,040
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013