Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Chávez y González

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1901BornEl Rosario
16 Nov 192423.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
1 Sep 193837.4AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
12 Dec 193837.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
3 Feb 197775.8ResignedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
27 Mar 198785.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Luis Chávez y González:
Archbishop Luis Chávez y González (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Salvador

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013