Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Machado y Escobar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel, El Salvador

Titular Bishop of Selemselae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1897Born
30 Jan 192123.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 194244.9AppointedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
15 Nov 194245.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
10 Jan 196870.1ResignedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
10 Jan 196870.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Selemselae
3 Oct 198385.9DiedBishop Emeritus of San Miguel, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Machado y Escobar
Bishop Miguel Angel Machado y Escobar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Salvador

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast