Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Antonio Vega Mantilla

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Juigalpa, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1919Born
26 May 194525.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 197051.2AppointedPrelate of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
30 Jan 197353.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
6 May 197353.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia
30 Apr 199171.7AppointedBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
29 Oct 199374.1ResignedBishop of Juigalpa, Nicaragua
14 Nov 200788.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Juigalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Pablo Antonio Vega Mantilla
Bishop Pablo Antonio Vega Mantilla (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Juigalpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagarote
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Juigalpa, Territorial Prelature of Juigalpa

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast