Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Antonetti

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1922BornRomagnano Sesia
26 May 194522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Novara, Italy
23 Feb 196845.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
24 Feb 196845.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
24 Feb 196845.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
12 May 196845.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
29 Jun 197350.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
15 Jun 197754.8AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
23 Sep 198866.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
24 Jun 199572.8AppointedPro-President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
21 Feb 199875.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agnese in Agone
21 Feb 199875.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 199875.5AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
7 Jun 199875.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agnese in Agone
5 Nov 199876.2RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
1 Mar 200885.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
10 Apr 201390.6DiedPresident Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Antonetti:
Lorenzo Cardinal Antonetti (born , died ) President Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
  • a cardinal for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • i: Bollettino, 30 May 1998
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 10 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015