Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Marra

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1931Born
19 Sep 195322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mileto, Italy
7 Jun 198655.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Jun 198655.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
28 Jun 198655.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
14 Nov 198958.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rebellum
14 Nov 198958.7AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
31 Jan 199664.9ResignedArchbishop of Italy, Military
17 May 199766.2AppointedArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
18 Nov 200675.7RetiredArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
5 Mar 201180.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
30 Jun 201281.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
11 Jul 201887.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Marra
Archbishop Giovanni Marra (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCinquefrondi, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained PriestChurch, Cinquefrondi, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 11 Jul 2018
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast