Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Mario Martínez de Lejarza Valle, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1922Born
30 Jul 195532.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Jan 196845.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
8 Jan 196845.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
25 Mar 196845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
8 Apr 198057.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Luis Mario Martínez de Lejarza Valle
Bishop Luis Mario Martínez de Lejarza Valle S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilboa, Spain
Ordained BishopSantiago, Cathedral, Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Death PlaceMiami, FL, Archdiocese of Miami, Florida, USA

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1968, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 19 Feb 2019

Quantcast