Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Francisco Vélez

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1839Born
19 Mar 186424.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 186424.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 188747.6AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
26 Dec 188748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
26 Mar 190161.5DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Manuel Francisco Vélez (VIAF: 87347142)
Bishop Manuel Francisco Vélez (born , died ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacapa, Guatemala
Ordained BishopXII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017