Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Ambrosio Guerra, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Verissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1866BornVolpedo
2 Apr 189023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 May 191548.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Cuba
26 May 191548.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hamatha
5 Sep 191548.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hamatha
17 Apr 191649.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
18 Jun 191649.5InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 Jan 192558.1ResignedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 Jan 192558.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Verissa
10 Jan 195790.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Felix Ambrosio Guerra:
Archbishop Felix Ambrosio Guerra S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cuba

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1957, Page 742
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013