Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Rodolfo Mendoza Hernández

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Selemselae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1934 BornGuatemala City
21 Sep 195823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
9 Jul 200469.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
9 Jul 200469.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Selemselae
25 Sep 200469.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selemselae
11 Nov 201682.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Rodolfo Mendoza Hernández
Bishop Gustavo Rodolfo Mendoza Hernández (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Guatemala

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,692
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Nov 2016