Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Vizcaino Prado

Bishop of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1951 BornGuatemala City
19 Mar 198028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
31 Dec 199645.5AppointedBishop of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu, Guatemala
8 Mar 199745.7Ordained BishopBishop of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Pablo Vizcaino Prado:
Bishop Pablo Vizcaino Prado (born ) Bishop of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Suchitepéquez-Retalhuleu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,930

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013