Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Hugo Palma Paúl

Bishop of Escuintla, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1958 Born
23 Dec 198325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
14 Jul 200143.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Escuintla, Guatemala
1 Sep 200143.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Escuintla, Guatemala
3 Apr 200445.9SucceededBishop of Escuintla, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Victor Hugo Palma Paúl
Bishop Victor Hugo Palma Paúl (born ) Bishop of Escuintla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiudad de Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala
Ordained BishopColegio Nuestra Señora de la Concepción, Escuintla, Diocese of Escuintla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Escuintla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,034

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast