Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oriano Quilici

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Tabla

Apostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1929BornS. Pietro a Vico, Italy
8 Dec 195425.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 197546.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tabla
13 Nov 197546.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Central African Republic
13 Nov 197546.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chad
13 Nov 197546.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Congo, Republic of
7 Dec 197546.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tabla
26 Jun 198151.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
11 Jul 199060.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
8 Jul 199767.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
8 Jul 199767.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liechtenstein
3 Nov 199868.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Oriano Quilici:
Archbishop Oriano Quilici (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Switzerland

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013