Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martino (Attiliius Mars Dominique) Giusti

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive

Titular Archbishop of Arae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1905Born
2 Jun 192822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
4 Jan 195650.2AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archive
24 May 198478.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arae in Numidia
24 May 198478.6RetiredPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archive
28 Jun 198478.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Arae in Numidia
1 Dec 198782.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive

MicroData Summary for Martino (Attiliius Mars Dominique) Giusti
Archbishop Martino (Attiliius Mars Dominique) Giusti (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Vatican Secret Archive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Campitelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast