Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuliano Agresti

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1921Born
29 Jun 194523.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 196948.2AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
21 Dec 196948.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
13 May 197250.7AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
25 Mar 197351.6AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
18 Sep 199069.0DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Agresti (VIAF: 71434335)
Archbishop Giuliano Agresti (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarberino di Mugello
Ordained BishopCathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 524

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast