Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fausto Tardelli

Bishop of Pistoia, Italy

Bishop of Pescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1951 Born
1974¹22.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lucca, Italy
29 Jun 197423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lucca, Italy
6 Mar 200453.1AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
2 May 200453.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
30 May 200453.4InstalledBishop of San Miniato, Italy
8 Oct 201463.7AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
8 Dec 201463.9InstalledBishop of Pistoia, Italy
14 Oct 202372.7AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
14 Jan 202473.0InstalledBishop of Pescia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fausto Tardelli
(VIAF: 88784656; WikiData: Q1398797)
Bishop Fausto Tardelli (born ) Bishop of Pistoia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSan Frediano, Basilica, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pistoia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,584
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 8 Oct 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2023
  • c014/i: AM, 14 Jan 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024