Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Ciattini

Bishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1951 BornCerreto Guidi
14 May 198938.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Miniato, Italy
15 Dec 201059.7AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
13 Feb 201159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy
6 Mar 201160.0InstalledBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ciattini:
Bishop Carlo Ciattini (born ) Bishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Massa Marittima-Piombino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013