Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Ricci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1928Born
8 Oct 195022.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 198758.8AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
7 Jun 198759.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
6 Mar 200475.8RetiredBishop of San Miniato, Italy
28 Nov 200880.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Ricci
Bishop Edoardo Ricci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePignona di Sesta Godano

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018