Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Betori

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1947 Born
26 Sep 197023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Foligno, Italy
5 Apr 200154.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Falerone
6 May 200154.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Falerone
8 Sep 200861.5AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
26 Oct 200861.6InstalledArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
18 Feb 201264.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201264.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
9 Jun 201265.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Betori (VIAF: 115499405)
Giuseppe Cardinal Betori (born ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2008
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1m14: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,973

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast