Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Benedetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1917Born
26 May 194023.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197457.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia, Italy
12 Dec 197457.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
23 Jan 197557.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
25 Mar 197659.0AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
10 Oct 199275.5RetiredBishop of Foligno, Italy
3 Aug 2017100.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Benedetti (VIAF: 15102896)
Bishop Giovanni Benedetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpello
Death PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno

  • a priest for 77.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 3 Aug 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast