Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Bellandi

Archbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1960 Born
4 Apr 198524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
4 May 201958.5AppointedArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy
6 Jul 201958.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Bellandi
Archbishop Andrea Bellandi (born ) Archbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salerno, Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 4 May 2019
  • c2+: CB, 16 May 2019
  • c3: CB, 5 Jul 2019
  • c1: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast