Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Enrico Delpini

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1951 Born
7 Jun 197523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jul 200755.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jul 200755.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
23 Sep 200756.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stephaniacum
7 Jul 201765.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Enrico Delpini (VIAF: 102028908)
Archbishop Mario Enrico Delpini (born ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallarate

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,521
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017