Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Luca Raimondi

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Feradi Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1966 Born
13 Jun 199225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Apr 202053.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Apr 202053.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
28 Jun 202053.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Luca Raimondi
Bishop Giovanni Luca Raimondi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCernusco sul Naviglio, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2020
  • c1: AM, 30 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2: AM, 28 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast