Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dionigi Cardinal Tettamanzi

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Ambrogio e Carlo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1934 BornRenate
28 Jun 195723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
1 Jul 198955.3AppointedArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
23 Sep 198955.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
6 Apr 199157.1ResignedArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
20 Apr 199561.1AppointedArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
18 Jun 199561.3InstalledArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
21 Feb 199863.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199863.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Ambrogio e Carlo
4 Nov 199864.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Ambrogio e Carlo
11 Jul 200268.3AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Sep 200268.5InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Jun 201177.3RetiredArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 Jul 2012³78.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vigevano, Italy
20 Jul 201379.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionigi Tettamanzi:
Dionigi Cardinal Tettamanzi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 30 Oct 1998
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,182
  • ab/vige: CB, 24 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Jun 2014