Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Busti

Bishop Emeritus of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1940 BornBusto Arsizio
27 Jun 196423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Jul 200766.6AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
22 Sep 200766.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
7 Oct 200766.8InstalledBishop of Mantova, Italy
3 Jun 201675.5RetiredBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Busti
Bishop Roberto Busti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mantova

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mantova.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,518
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016