Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Caporello

Bishop Emeritus of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1931 Born
10 Jul 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
24 Jul 198251.1AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
24 Jul 198251.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caprulae
19 Sep 198251.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caprulae
28 Jun 198655.0AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
7 Sep 198655.2InstalledBishop of Mantova, Italy
13 Jul 200776.0RetiredBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Caporello (VIAF: 90320677)
Bishop Egidio Caporello (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained PriestSan Benedetto Vecchio, Church, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mantova.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast