Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselmo Guido Pecorari

Apostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Populonia

Apostolic Nuncio to Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1946 BornSermide
27 Sep 197024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mantova, Italy
29 Nov 200357.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Populonia
29 Nov 200357.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
11 Jan 200457.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Populonia
17 Jan 200861.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
24 May 200862.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
25 Apr 201467.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
11 Jul 201468.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Guido Pecorari:
Archbishop Anselmo Guido Pecorari (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Bulgaria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Bulgaria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,510
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Jul 2014