Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milton Luis Tróccoli Cebedio

Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1964 Born
8 May 198824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
27 Nov 200945.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
27 Nov 200945.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
20 Dec 200945.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
15 Jun 201854.2AppointedBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
8 Jul 201854.3InstalledBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este, Uruguay
2 Mar 202055.9AppointedBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas, Uruguay
15 Mar 202056.0InstalledBishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Milton Luis Tróccoli Cebedio
Bishop Milton Luis Tróccoli Cebedio (born ) Bishop of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Archdiocese of Montevideo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maldonado-Punta del Este-Minas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,332
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 4 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2020
  • i: CB, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast