Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San José de Mayo

Dioecesis Sancti Iosephi in Uraquaria



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 15 November 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Montevideo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uruguay
  • Square Kilometers: 11,482 (4,434 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Sarandi 371, 80000 San Jose de Mayo, Uruguay
  • Telephone: (034) 22124
  • Fax: 27328

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 November 1955ErectedArchdiocese of Montevideo
Diocese of Salto
Diocese of San José de Mayo (erected)
17 December 1960Territory LostDiocese of Salto
Diocese of San José de Mayo
Diocese of Mercedes (erected)
25 November 1961Territory LostDiocese of San José de Mayo Diocese of Canelones (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
196695,380100,73094.7%261273,532124012ap1967
1968105,100110,80094.9%201215,004104012ap1971
197699,000107,00092.5%92119,00083613ap1977
1980101,700116,00087.7%93128,475103312ap1981
199085,700113,00075.8%143175,04172612ap1991
199992,200122,00075.6%164204,61092912ap2000
200092,900123,00075.5%154194,88982912ap2001
200193,600124,00075.5%154194,92682912ap2002
200294,400125,10075.5%154194,96883212ap2003
200390,357112,40080.4%145194,755103312ap2004
200485,000112,40175.6%146204,250112111ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011