Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Eduardo Fajardo Bustamante

Bishop of Salto, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1961 Born
8 May 198826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Minas, Uruguay
27 Jun 200745.9AppointedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
8 Sep 200746.1Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
15 Jun 202058.9AppointedBishop of Salto, Uruguay
15 Aug 202059.0InstalledBishop of Salto, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Arturo Eduardo Fajardo Bustamante
Bishop Arturo Eduardo Fajardo Bustamante (born ) Bishop of Salto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAiguá, Diocese of Minas
Ordained BishopSan José, Cathedral Basilica, San José de Mayo, Diocese of San José de Mayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,504
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2020
  • i: AM, 25 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Aug 2020

Quantcast