Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Januariusz Mikołaj Bolonek

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bulgaria

Titular Archbishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1938BornHuta Dlotowska, Poland
17 Dec 196123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
25 Sep 198950.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madaurus
25 Sep 198950.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cōte d’Ivoire
20 Oct 198950.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Madaurus
18 Nov 198950.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Niger
18 Nov 198950.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Burkina Faso
23 Jan 199556.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
30 Sep 199859.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
11 Nov 199960.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uruguay
24 May 200869.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
4 May 201172.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Macedonia
6 Dec 201375.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
6 Dec 201375.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Macedonia
2 Mar 201677.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Januariusz Mikołaj Bolonek
Archbishop Januariusz Mikołaj Bolonek (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Bulgaria

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,582
  • r: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016