Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Łódź | |||
10 December 1920 | Erected | Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw} | Diocese of Łódź (erected) |
28 October 1925 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Kielce
Diocese of Łódź Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau) | Diocese of Częstochowa (erected) |
25 March 1992 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Łódź (Łęczyca in Tum along with Dmosin, Głowno, Głowno Osiny, and Głowno Zabrzeźnia (in Stryków))
Diocese of Płock (Osmolin, Pacyna, Sanniki, Słubice, Zyck (from Gąbin), Suserz, and Trąbki (from Gostynin)) Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw} (Biała Rawska, Brzozów, Krośniewice, Kutno, Lubochnia, Łowicz Kolegiata, Łowicz Sw. Ducha, Mszczonów, Rawa Mazowiecka, Shierniewice, Sochaczew, Żychlin, and Żyrardów) | Diocese of Łowicz (erected) |
Archdiocese of Łódź | |||
25 March 1992 | Elevated | Diocese of Łódź | Archdiocese of Łódź |
24 February 2004 | Elevated | Archdiocese of Łódź (became a Metropolitan) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Łódź | ||||||||||||
1950 | 1,000,000 | 1,100,000 | 90.9% | 238 | 76 | 314 | 3,184 | 140 | 553 | 138 | ap1951 | |
1970 | 1,150,000 | 1,350,000 | 85.2% | 374 | 111 | 485 | 2,371 | 163 | 820 | 147 | ap1971 | |
1980 | 1,361,000 | 1,489,000 | 91.4% | 400 | 129 | 529 | 2,572 | 176 | 820 | 157 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 1,592,100 | 1,700,000 | 93.7% | 469 | 142 | 611 | 2,605 | 338 | 842 | 204 | ap1991 | |
Archdiocese of Łódź | ||||||||||||
1999 | 1,470,000 | 1,550,000 | 94.8% | 520 | 155 | 675 | 2,177 | 378 | 672 | 209 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 1,465,000 | 1,545,000 | 94.8% | 527 | 155 | 682 | 2,148 | 344 | 678 | 209 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 1,460,000 | 1,540,000 | 94.8% | 546 | 130 | 676 | 2,159 | 346 | 677 | 211 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 1,460,000 | 1,540,000 | 94.8% | 559 | 133 | 692 | 2,109 | 336 | 570 | 212 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 1,460,000 | 1,540,000 | 94.8% | 558 | 132 | 690 | 2,115 | 338 | 559 | 212 | ap2004 | |
2004 | 1,460,000 | 1,540,000 | 94.8% | 564 | 184 | 748 | 1,951 | 400 | 585 | 212 | ap2005 | |
2013 | 1,410,000 | 1,490,000 | 94.6% | 573 | 190 | 763 | 1,847 | 240 | 519 | 218 | ap2014 | |
2016 | 1,380,000 | 1,460,000 | 94.5% | 561 | 172 | 733 | 1,882 | 235 | 493 | 218 | ap2017 | |
2019 | 1,330,000 | 1,410,000 | 94.3% | 557 | 166 | 723 | 1,839 | 215 | 439 | 219 | ap2020 | |
2021 | 1,345,600 | 1,426,630 | 94.3% | 554 | 177 | 731 | 1,840 | 233 | 431 | 219 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 13 Nov 2023 |
✠